US SB977 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Sherman Act to make oil-producing and exporting cartels illegal.
Title
NOPEC No Oil Producing and Exporting Cartels Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 542. |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/14/2022 without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2393 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Ordered to be Reported.