US SB964 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1773-1774)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1773-1774)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize dedicated domestic terrorism offices within the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Justice, and the Federal Bureau of Investigation to analyze and monitor domestic terrorist activity and require the Federal Government to take steps to prevent domestic terrorism.
Title
Domestic Terrorism Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1773-1774) |
Same As/Similar To
SB963 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30.
SB4255 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB350 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to H.R. 350 (Record Vote No. 210) entered in Senate.
SB4255 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB350 (Related) 2022-05-26 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to H.R. 350 (Record Vote No. 210) entered in Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/964/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s964/BILLS-117s964is.pdf |