US SB958 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-204.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-204.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to expand the allowable use criteria for new access points grants for community health centers.
Title
Maximizing Outcomes through Better Investments in Lifesaving Equipment for (MOBILE) Health Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 414 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-204. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 7 (Roll no. 465). (text: CR H8152) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8273-8274) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 958. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8152-8153) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-09-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4444; text: CR S4444) |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 441. |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Murray with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5141 (Same As) 2022-09-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384.