US SB957 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 117-29. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to designate periods during which any individual may dispose of controlled substances medications at VA medical facilities with an on-site pharmacy or a physical location dedicated for law enforcement purposes. The bill also authorizes the VA to carry out public information campaigns regarding the designated disposal periods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DUMP Opioids Act Dispose Unused Medications and Prescription Opioids Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 424 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-29SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-29. (TXT | PDF)
2021-07-29SenateSigned by President.
2021-07-28SenatePresented to President.
2021-07-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-07-27HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 224). (text: 07/26/2021 CR H3883)
2021-07-27HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3931-3932)
2021-07-26HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-07-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 957.
2021-07-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3883-3884)
2021-07-26HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-04-26HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-04-26HouseReceived in the House.
2021-04-22SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-04-22SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2153)
2021-04-22SenateS.Amdt.1459 Amendment SA 1459 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2021-04-22SenateS.Amdt.1459 Amendment SA 1459 proposed by Senator Kennedy. (consideration: CR S2153; text: CR S2153) In the nature of a substitute.
2021-04-22SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2152-2153)
2021-04-22SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2021-03-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2591 (Same As) 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback