US SB944 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to promote low-carbon, high-octane fuels, to protect public health, and to improve vehicle efficiency and performance, and for other purposes.
Title
Next Generation Fuels Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1608 (Related) 2023-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
SB785 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2434 (Same As) 2023-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
SB785 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2434 (Same As) 2023-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/944/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s944/BILLS-118s944is.pdf |