US SB941 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Yellowstone Gateway Protection Act This bill withdraws specified National Forest System land in the Custer Gallatin National Forest in Park County, Montana, identified on the map titled "Emigrant Crevice Proposed Withdrawal Area," dated November 10, 2016, from: (1) location, entry, and patent under mining laws; and (2) disposition under all laws pertaining to mineral and geothermal leasing. Any land within the withdrawal area that is acquired by the federal government after enactment of this bill must be immediately withdrawn in accordance with this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Yellowstone Gateway Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-402.
2018-11-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 688.
2018-11-29SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-07-26SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2017-04-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB4644 (Same As) 2018-10-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 774.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback