US SB933 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to amend the Carl Levin and Howard P. "Buck" McKeon National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015 to modify requirements relating to data centers of certain Federal agencies, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Data Center Enhancement Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
2023-04-27SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 118-15.
2023-03-29SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2023-03-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB5218 (Same As) 2023-08-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback