US SB931 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve the visibility, accountability, and oversight of agency software asset management practices, and for other purposes.
Title
Strengthening Agency Management and Oversight of Software Assets Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156. |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-73. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1695 (Same As) 2023-07-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 39 - 0.