US SB929 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to amend title 28, United States Code, to redefine the eastern and middle judicial districts of North Carolina. This bill moves portions of four counties encompassing the Fort Bragg Military Reservation and Camp Mackall from the Middle District to the Eastern District of North Carolina.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to amend title 28, United States Code, to redefine the eastern and middle judicial districts of North Carolina.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-08-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-08-02HouseReceived in the House.
2019-07-31SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-30SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5204)
2019-07-30SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5203-5204)
2019-03-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback