US SB914 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-271.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-271.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2025 and revises the Integrated Coastal and Ocean Observation System (IOOS), which is a network of federal and regional entities that provide information about the nation's coasts, oceans, and Great Lakes, as well as new tools and forecasts to improve safety, enhance the economy, and protect the environment. The bill revises the authority of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to conduct scientific assessments related to storms, including to (1) direct NOAA to seek public input before the Named Storm Event Model (the official meteorological and oceanographic computerized model which utilizes data to replicate the magnitude, timing, and spatial variations of winds, rainfall, and storm surges associated with named storms for which post-storm assessments are conducted) takes effect, and (2) allow NOAA to deploy sensors to areas in coastal states that are at the highest risk of experiencing geophysical events that would cause indeterminate losses. The bill provides statutory authority for NOAA's National Water Center. (The center currently exists at NOAA as the research and operational center of excellence for hydrologic analyses, forecasting, and related decision support services.) Additionally, the bill directs the National Weather Service (NWS) to make a policy directive for the National Water Center publicly available. The NWS must also (1) initiate and lead all research and development activities to develop operational water resource prediction and related decision support products, (2) collaborate with relevant state and federal agencies regarding total water prediction, and (3) collaboratively develop capabilities necessary for total water predictive capacity.
Title
Coordinated Ocean Observations and Research Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-271. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 914 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7556) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6102-6107) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 914. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6102-6108) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Case moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-08-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S4639-4644) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2501 Amendment SA 2501 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.2501 Amendment SA 2501 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S4647; text: CR S4639-4644) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4647) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 318. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-168. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB810 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Chemistry
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Floods and storm protection
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
Hydrology and hydrography
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Natural disasters
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Chemistry
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental technology
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Floods and storm protection
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
Hydrology and hydrography
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Natural disasters
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection