US SB894 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to consult with the Department of Defense to identify and refer members of the Armed Forces with health care occupations for employment with the VA during their separation from the Armed Forces. The VA must refer interested members to a recruiter for consideration of open positions in the member's specialty and geography of interest. Referrals must not be made earlier than one year before the member's separation from the Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hire Veteran Health Heroes Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-67.
2021-11-30SenateSigned by President.
2021-11-19SenatePresented to President.
2021-11-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-11-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
2021-11-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 894.
2021-11-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6252-6253)
2021-11-15HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-07-26HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-07-26HouseReceived in the House.
2021-07-26SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-07-21SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5024; text: CR S5024)
2021-06-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 85.
2021-06-24SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester with an amendment. Without written report.
2021-05-26SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2021-04-28SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-03-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2151 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback