US SB893 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020 This bill requires the President, in consultation with relevant federal agencies, to develop a strategy to secure and protect U.S. fifth and future generations (5G) systems and infrastructure. Such strategy, to be known as the National Strategy to Secure 5G and Next Generation Wireless Communications, shall (1) ensure the security of 5G wireless communications systems and infrastructure within the United States; (2) assist mutual defense treaty allies, strategic partners, and other countries in maximizing the security of 5G systems and infrastructure; and (3) protect the competitiveness of U.S. companies, privacy of U.S. consumers, and integrity of standards-setting bodies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure 5G and Beyond Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-129. (TXT | PDF)
2020-03-23HouseSigned by President.
2020-03-16HousePresented to President.
2020-03-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-11HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1614-1615)
2020-03-11HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1614-1615)
2020-03-11HouseMr. Pallone asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2020-03-09HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-03-09HouseReceived in the House.
2020-03-05SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1501-1502)
2020-03-04SenateS.Amdt.1510 Amendment SA 1510 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-04SenateS.Amdt.1510 Amendment SA 1510 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S1507; text: CR S1501-1502) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-03-04SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-04SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1506-1507)
2019-12-19SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 395.
2019-12-19SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-184.
2019-07-24SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-03-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB2881 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 403.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback