US SB891 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide payment of Medal of Honor special pension under such title to the surviving spouse of a deceased Medal of Honor recipient, and for other purposes.
Title
Medal of Honor Surviving Spouses Recognition Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1826 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/891/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s891/BILLS-116s891is.pdf |