US SB89 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to secure medical opinions for veterans with service-connected disabilities who die from COVID-19 to determine whether their service-connected disabilities were the principal or contributory causes of death, and for other purposes.
Title
Ensuring Survivor Benefits during COVID–19 Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-07-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5023; text: CR S5023) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 83. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB746 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.