US SB859 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RIVER Act Reliable Investment in Vital Energy Reauthorization Act This bill extends through FY2036 authorization and eligibility for the program of hydroelectric production incentives and incentive payments to the owners or operators of hydroelectric facilities at existing dams to make capital improvements directly related to improving efficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIVER Act Reliable Investment in Vital Energy Reauthorization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 184.
2019-09-10SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-81.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-03-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3361 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback