US SB858 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to provide blood testing, during annual physical examinations of DOD firefighters, to determine and document exposure to perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances.
Title
Protecting Military Firefighters from PFAS Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1863 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Blood and blood diseases
Department of Defense
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Worker safety and health
Blood and blood diseases
Department of Defense
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/858/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s858/BILLS-116s858is.pdf |