US SB849 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

U.S.S. Frank E. Evans Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

U.S.S. Frank E. Evans Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2019-03-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback