US SB848 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on October 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Became Public Law No: 117-49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on October 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Became Public Law No: 117-49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 in order to improve the service obligation verification process for TEACH Grant recipients, and for other purposes.
Title
Consider Teachers Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 406 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-49. |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-09-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 16 (Roll no. 302). (text: CR 7/26/2021 H3851-3852) |
2021-09-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5496) |
2021-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 848. |
2021-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3851-3854) |
2021-07-26 | House | Mr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-04-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-04-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2246-2247) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2246-2247) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2048 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.