US SB841 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an agency to reimburse federal, state, and local income taxes incurred by an individual for travel, transportation, or relocation expenses.
Title
Relocation Expense Parity Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2265 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Transportation costs
Government operations and politics
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/841/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s841/BILLS-116s841is.pdf |