US SB833 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend XVIII of the Social Security Act to allow the Secretary of Health and Human Services to negotiate fair prescription drug prices under part D of the Medicare program.
Title
Empowering Medicare Seniors to Negotiate Drug Prices Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1227 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB352 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB386 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1279 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB352 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB386 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1279 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/833/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s833/BILLS-117s833is.pdf |