US SB831 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-137. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-137. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 West Pike Street in Canonsburg, Pennsylvania, as the "Police Officer Scott Bashioum Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 West Pike Street in Canonsburg, Pennsylvania, as the "Police Officer Scott Bashioum Post Office Building."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 120 West Pike Street in Canonsburg, Pennsylvania, as the "Police Officer Scott Bashioum Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-137. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-03-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-03-08 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1352) |
2018-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 831. |
2018-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1351-1352) |
2018-03-05 | House | Mr. Palmer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-06-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-06-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3459; text: CR S3459) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 92. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Law enforcement officers
Pennsylvania
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Law enforcement officers
Pennsylvania
Postal service