US SB826 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
WILD Act Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 several programs that provide funding for wildlife conservation and sets forth requirements for invasive species management. TITLE I--PARTNERS FOR FISH AND WILDLIFE PROGRAM REAUTHORIZATION (Sec. 1001) This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 the Partners for Fish and Wildlife Program. TITLE II--FISH AND WILDLIFE COORDINATION (Sec. 2002) This bill amends the Fish and Wildlife Coordination Act to direct federal agencies that have duties relating to invasive species management for the protection of water and wildlife to: (1) inhibit or reduce the populations of invasive species and effectuate restoration or reclamation efforts on land the agencies manage, and (2) develop a strategic plan for implementing an invasive species program designed to achieve a substantive annual net reduction of invasive species populations or infested acreage in managed areas. Under a strategic plan, agencies must prioritize the use of methods that control and manage invasive species in the least costly manner, are based on sound science, and minimize environmental impacts. Further, agencies must expedite projects and activities that are in areas at high risk for invasive species and require immediate action to address the risk. The bill sets forth: (1) requirements for how agencies may use funds made available for invasive species management, and (2) reporting requirements. TITLE III--WILDLIFE CONSERVATION (Sec. 3001) This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 the African Elephant Conservation Act, the Asian Elephant Conservation Act of 1997, the Rhinoceros and Tiger Conservation Act of 1994, the Great Ape Conservation Fund, and the Marine Turtle Conservation Fund. This bill amends the Great Ape Conservation Act of 2000, including to authorize the Department of the Interior to award a multi-year grant for carrying out a project that is an effective, long-term conservation strategy for great apes (defined in the Act as chimpanzees, gorillas, bonobos, orangutans, and gibbons) and their habitats. This bill amends the Marine Turtle Conservation Act of 2004 to make a wildlife management authority of a U.S. territory eligible for financial assistance for marine turtle conservation. TITLE IV--PRIZE COMPETITIONS (Sec. 4002) The U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service must establish Theodore Roosevelt Genius Prizes for: (1) prevention of wildlife poaching and trafficking, (2) promotion of wildlife conservation, (3) management of invasive species, (4) protection of endangered species, and (5) nonlethal management of human-wildlife conflicts. The bill establishes advisory boards for those prizes.
Title
WILD Act Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-09-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-08-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-08-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-08-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-08-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-08-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-06-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3375-3380; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S3375-3380) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 91. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-73. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2217) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB5885 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
HB5885 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Africa
American Samoa
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquatic ecology
Asia
Caribbean area
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Guam
Hunting and fishing
International organizations and cooperation
Mammals
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
Reptiles
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Africa
American Samoa
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquatic ecology
Asia
Caribbean area
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Guam
Hunting and fishing
International organizations and cooperation
Mammals
Northern Mariana Islands
Puerto Rico
Reptiles
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection