US SB816 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small Scale LNG Access Act of 2019 This bill provides that an application for the exportation of natural gas that does not exceed 51.75 billion cubic feet per year shall be deemed consistent with the public interest and granted by the Federal Power Commission without modification or delay. Applications for exportation of natural gas to any nation subject to sanctions imposed by the United States may not be expedited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Scale LNG Access Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 175.
2019-08-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-73.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-03-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB1836 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback