US SB806 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
College for All Act of 2017 This bill amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 (HEA) to establish a grant program to eliminate tuition and required fees: (1) for all students at community colleges and two-year tribal colleges and universities, and (2) for working- and middle-class students at four-year public institutions of higher education (IHEs). Additionally, the bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the HEA to: reauthorize the Federal TRIO Programs, the Gaining Early Awareness and Readiness for Undergraduate Programs (i.e., GEAR UP), and the Federal Work Study Program for FY2018-FY2027; eliminate existing base guarantees of Federal Work Study funds to IHEs and require funds to be allocated based solely on the aggregate need of the institution's students; modify the interest rate formulas for federal student loans to revise applicable rates on new loans disbursed on or after July 1, 2017; and allow student loan borrowers to modify interest rates on outstanding federal student loans to current rates. Finally, it directs the Department of Education to use any excess revenue generated by the Federal Direct Loan program to carry out the Federal Pell Grant program.
Title
College for All Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1880 (Same As) 2017-04-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB1614 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB1614 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Educational guidance
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Minority education
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Educational guidance
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Minority education
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/806/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s806/BILLS-115s806is.pdf |