US SB801 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain payment information relating to covered drugs under the Medicare prescription drug benefit and Medicaid to be disclosed to additional entities. Specifically, certain subsidy and rebate information, as reported by prescription drug plan sponsors and drug manufacturers, may be disclosed to the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission and the Medicaid and Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) Payment and Access Commission, in accordance with specified confidentiality restrictions.
Title
A bill to amend titles XVIII and XIX of the Social Security Act to provide the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission and the Medicaid and CHIP Payment and Access Commission with access to certain drug payment information, including certain rebate information.
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1264 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1781 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
HB1781 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/801/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s801/BILLS-116s801is.pdf |