US SB796 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-69.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to implement the maternity care coordination program. The VA must provide community maternity care providers (i.e., non-VA maternity care providers) with training and support with respect to the unique needs of pregnant and postpartum veterans, particularly regarding mental and behavioral health conditions in relation to the service of the veterans in the Armed Forces. Additionally, the Government Accountability Office must report on maternal mortality and severe maternal morbidity among pregnant and postpartum veterans, with a focus on racial and ethnic disparities in maternal health outcomes for veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Moms Who Served Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 414 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-69.
2021-11-30SenateSigned by President.
2021-11-19SenatePresented to President.
2021-11-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-11-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 9 (Roll no. 374).
2021-11-16HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6297-6298)
2021-11-16HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-11-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 796.
2021-11-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6286-6288)
2021-11-16HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-10-08HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-10-08HouseReceived in the House.
2021-10-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-10-07SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6993-6994)
2021-10-07SenateS.Amdt.3860 Amendment SA 3860 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2021-10-07SenateS.Amdt.3860 Amendment SA 3860 proposed by Senator Lujan for Senator Tester. (consideration: CR S6993-6994; text: CR S7011-7012) In the nature of a substitute.
2021-10-07SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6993-6994)
2021-10-07SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2021-06-23SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-03-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB958 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback