US SB785 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-451. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-451. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alaska Native Veterans Land Allotment Equity Act This bill amends the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act to revise provisions regarding land allotments for Alaska Native Vietnam veterans. Eligibility is expanded to include all Alaska Native veterans who served between August 5, 1964, and May 7, 1975. Allotments may be selected from vacant federal lands or lands that have been selected or conveyed to the state of Alaska or an Alaska Native corporation, if the state or corporation relinquishes or conveys the land to the United States for allotment. Land may not be selected from: (1) the right-of-way of the TransAlaska Pipeline; (2) the inner or outer corridor of that right-of-way; or (3) a unit of the National Park System, a National Preserve, or a National Monument. An heir of a deceased eligible veteran, regardless of the cause of death, may apply for and receive an allotment. Alaska Native Vietnam veterans who selected an allotment of land before enactment of this bill and who were not conveyed the allotment before the enactment of this bill may reselect land.
Title
Alaska Native Veterans Land Allotment Equity Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-451. Additional views filed. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 710. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1867 (Same As) 2017-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
SB1481 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB1481 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Veterans' pensions and compensation