US SB782 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grand Canyon Bison Management Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to publish a management plan to reduce, through humane lethal culling by skilled public volunteers and other nonlethal means, the population of bison in the Grand Canyon National Park in Arizona that Interior determines are detrimental to the uses of the Park. Such a volunteer may remove a full bison harvested from the Park. Interior shall coordinate with the Arizona Game and Fish Commission regarding the development and implementation of the management plan. In developing such plan, Interior must comply with all applicable federal environmental laws, including the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969.
Title
Grand Canyon Bison Management Act
Sponsors
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 329. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-184. Additional and Minority views filed. |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-338. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2319) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1443 (Same As) 2015-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Animals
Arizona
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Mammals
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Arizona
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Mammals
Parks, recreation areas, trails