US SB782 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gettysburg National Military Park Expansion Act - Requires the inclusion in Gettysburg National Military Park of the Gettysburg Train Station and the property that is adjacent to Plum Run in Cumberland Township, Pennsylvania. Permits the Secretary of the Interior to acquire such properties only: (1) by donation, or (2) by purchase from a willing seller if efforts to acquire such property without cost have been exhausted.
Title
Gettysburg National Military Park Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 394. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment. With written report No. 113-168. |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1513 (Related) 2014-01-14 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pennsylvania
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Railroads