US SB744 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-31. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Effective Prosecution of Possession of Biological Toxins and Agents Act of 2019 This bill revises the criminal prohibition on the shipment, transport, possession, or receipt of a biological agent or toxin by a restricted person. Specifically, it updates references to the lists of agents and toxins covered by the prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Effective Prosecution of Possession of Biological Toxins and Agents Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-25SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-31. (TXT | PDF)
2019-07-25SenateSigned by President.
2019-07-15SenatePresented to President.
2019-07-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5331)
2019-07-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 744.
2019-07-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5331-5332)
2019-07-10HouseMs. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-05-20HouseReceived in the House.
2019-05-20SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-05-16SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2929)
2019-05-16SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2929)
2019-03-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB1986 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 104.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback