US SB743 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-170. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Merrill's Marauders Congressional Gold Medal Act This bill directs Congress to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the 5307th Composite Unit (Provisional), commonly known as Merrill's Marauders, in recognition of their bravery and outstanding service in the jungles of Burma (Myanmar) during World War II. Following its award, the gold medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution, where it shall be displayed and made available for research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merrill's Marauders Congressional Gold Medal Act

Sponsors

Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]
Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY]
Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-17SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-170. (TXT | PDF)
2020-10-17SenateSigned by President.
2020-10-06SenatePresented to President.
2020-09-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-22HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4712)
2020-09-22HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4712)
2020-09-22HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
2020-09-22HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
2020-09-22HouseMr. Cleaver asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2019-12-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-12-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-12-09HouseReceived in the House.
2019-12-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-05SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6895-6896)
2019-12-05SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6895-6896)
2019-03-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB906 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback