US SB739 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-11-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to clarify jurisdiction with respect to certain Bureau of Reclamation pumped storage development, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to clarify jurisdiction with respect to certain Bureau of Reclamation pumped storage development, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579. |
2024-11-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2024-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1607 (Same As) 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-162.