US SB73 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to ban the Federal procurement of certain drones and other unmanned aircraft systems, and for other purposes.
Title
American Security Drone Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 666. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-267. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5640 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB4521 (Related) 2022-05-05 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB4521 (Related) 2022-05-05 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.