US SB715 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the productivity and energy efficiency of the manufacturing sector as well as the development of smart manufacturing technologies (certain advanced technologies in information, automation, monitoring, computation, sensing, modeling, and networking). The Department of Energy (DOE) must complete a national plan for smart manufacturing technology development and deployment to improve the productivity and energy efficiency of the U.S. manufacturing sector. DOE must revise the plan biennially to account for advancements in information and communication technology and manufacturing needs. DOE may make grants to states for supporting the implementation of smart manufacturing technologies. States must use those grants to (1) provide access to shared supercomputing facilities to small- and medium-sized manufacturers, (2) fund research and development of transformational manufacturing processes and materials technology that advance smart manufacturing, and (3) provide tools and training to aid the adoption of energy management systems and implement smart manufacturing technologies in the manufacturers' facilities. DOE must expand the scope of technologies covered by Industrial Assessment Centers to (1) include smart manufacturing technologies and practices, and (2) equip the centers' directors with the training and tools necessary to provide technical assistance in smart manufacturing technologies and practices. DOE must (1) study how it can increase access to existing high-performance computing resources in the National Laboratories, and (2) facilitate access to the laboratories by small- and medium-sized manufacturers.
Title
Smart Manufacturing Leadership Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-80. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1633 (Related) 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government studies and investigations
Industrial facilities
Industrial policy and productivity
Manufacturing
Materials
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government studies and investigations
Industrial facilities
Industrial policy and productivity
Manufacturing
Materials
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business