US SB693 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Became Public Law No: 116-67.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

National POW/MIA Flag Act The bill changes the days on which the POW/MIA flag is required to be displayed at specified locations to all days on which the U.S. flag is displayed. (Current law requires the POW/MIA flag to be displayed only on Armed Forces Day, Memorial Day, Flag Day, Independence Day, National POW/MIA Recognition Day, and Veterans Day.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National POW/MIA Flag Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-67.
2019-11-07HouseSigned by President.
2019-10-29HousePresented to President.
2019-10-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8354)
2019-10-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 693.
2019-10-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8354-8355)
2019-10-22HouseMr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House.
2019-05-06SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-05-02SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2624)
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2624)
2019-03-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB1579 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback