US SB684 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Secretary of Transportation to carry out an active transportation investment program to make grants to eligible applicants to build safe and connected options for bicycles and walkers within and between communities, and for other purposes.
Title
Connecting America’s Active Transportation System Act
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
HB2991 (Related) 2021-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3566 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2991 (Related) 2021-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3566 (Related) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/684/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s684/BILLS-117s684is.pdf |