US SB675 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prompt and Fast Action to Stop Damages Act of 2019 authorizes military departments to provide water for agricultural purposes in areas in which activities on a military installation have contaminated a water source with perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substances, such as perfluorooctanoic acid (PFOA) or perfluorooctane sulfonate (PFOS). The military departments may provide uncontaminated water or provide treatment for contaminated water. The agricultural products produced must be destined for human consumption. The Department of the Air Force may acquire certain real property adjacent to an Air Force base that has shown signs of contamination from PFOA and PFOS due to activities on the base. The Department of Defense must submit to Congress a remediation plan for water at or adjacent to a military base that is contaminated with PFOA or PFOS.
Title
Prompt and Fast Action to Stop Damages Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1567 (Same As) 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
Water quality
Water use and supply
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/675/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s675/BILLS-116s675is.pdf |