US SB663 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-13-2)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Belated Thank You to the Merchant Mariners of World War II Act of 2009 - Establishes in the Treasury the Merchant Mariner Equity Compensation Fund for payments by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs of a monthly benefit of $1,000 to each individual who, between December 7, 1941, and December 31, 1946, was a documented member of the U.S. merchant marine (including the Army Transport Service and the Naval Transport Service) serving as a crewmember of a vessel that was operated in U.S. waters by the War Shipping Administration or the Office of Defense Transportation and under contract to, or the property of, the United States. Requires such individuals to: (1) apply for such benefit before October 1, 2009; and (2) not have received benefits under the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944.
Title
Belated Thank You to the Merchant Mariners of World War II Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. | |
2009-03-19 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB23 (Related) 2009-05-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Government trust funds
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/663/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s663/BILLS-111s663is.pdf |