US SB66 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the South Florida ecosystem. An algal bloom is a rapid growth of algae that may create toxic or hypoxic (severely low-oxygen) conditions that are harmful to humans, animals, aquatic ecosystems, and the economy. The Inter-Agency Task Force on Harmful Algal Blooms and Hypoxia must assess potential approaches to reduce harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the ecosystem. The task force must also submit a plan, based on the assessment, for reducing, mitigating, and controlling harmful algal blooms and hypoxia in the region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Florida Clean Coastal Waters Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 412 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-05-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 7 (Roll no. 152). (text: 05/10/2022 CR H4731-4732)
2022-05-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4832-4833)
2022-05-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-05-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 66.
2022-05-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4731-4733)
2022-05-10HouseMs. Stevens moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2022-03-08HouseHeld at the desk.
2022-03-08HouseReceived in the House.
2022-03-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2022-03-08SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1066-1067; text: CR S1066-1067)
2022-02-03SenateBy Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-64.
2021-12-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
2021-12-17SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell without amendment. Without written report.
2021-06-16SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-01-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB565 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback