US SB65 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes importation limits on goods produced using forced labor in China, especially the Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region, and imposes sanctions related to such forced labor. The Department of Homeland Security shall report to Congress a strategy for preventing the importation of goods produced in China using forced labor. The strategy must contain certain information, including a list of entities working with the government in Xinjiang to move forced labor or Uyghurs, Kazakhs, Kyrgyz, or members of other persecuted groups out of Xinjiang. The U.S. Customs and Border Protection shall generally presume that goods produced by these entities and certain other entities, generally those sourcing material from Xinjiang or involved with Chinese government forced labor programs, are barred from importation into the United States. The bill also expands existing asset- and visa-blocking sanctions related to Xinjiang to cover foreign individuals and entities responsible for serious human rights abuses in connection with forced labor. The Department of State shall report to Congress a strategy to enhance international awareness of forced labor in Xinjiang and to address such forced labor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uyghur Forced Labor Prevention Act Uyghur Forced Labor Prevention Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-07-16HouseReceived in the House.
2021-07-15SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-07-14SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4905-4908; text: CR S4906-4908)
2021-06-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 87.
2021-06-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-06-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2021-01-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB6256 (Related) 2021-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-78. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback