US SB645 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Measuring the Economic Impact of Broadband Act of 2018 This bill requires the Department of Commerce to assess, and submit a report regarding, the effects of the digital economy on the U.S. economy. In conducting the assessment, Commerce must: (1) consider the impact of the deployment and adoption of digital-enabling infrastructure and broadband, e-commerce and platform-enabled peer-to-peer commerce, and the production and consumption of digital media; and (2) consult with other government agencies, businesses, rural and urban Internet service and telecommunications infrastructure providers, and consumer and community organizations.
Title
Measuring the Economic Impact of Broadband Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7621-7622; text: CR S7621-7622) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 613. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-341. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5093 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Educational technology and distance education
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Economic performance and conditions
Educational technology and distance education
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications