US SB624 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Same Day Registration Act This bill requires states with a voter registration requirement to make same-day voter registration available at the polling place on any day voting is permitted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Same Day Registration Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB93 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1438 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB7427 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback