US SB612 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey, without consideration, to the city of Tucson, Arizona, the reversionary interest of the United States in and to an approximately 172.8-acre parcel of land owned by the city for the purpose of unencumbering the title to such land to enable its economic development.
Title
Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525. |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-306. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1547 (Same As) 2018-07-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 526.