US SB609 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to withdraw the National Forest System land in the Ruby Mountains subdistrict of the Humboldt-Toiyabe National Forest and the National Wildlife Refuge System land in Ruby Lake National Wildlife Refuge, Elko and White Pine Counties, Nevada, from operation under the mineral leasing laws.
Title
Ruby Mountains Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-70. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |