US SB599 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes that aliens associated with a criminal gang shall be inadmissible into the United States and deported if already in the country. Such aliens are (1) subject to mandatory detention, (2) barred from receiving asylum, (3) ineligible for temporary protected status, and (4) barred from receiving special immigrant juvenile status. An alien associated with a criminal gang is one who (1) has been a member of a criminal gang or has participated in a gang's activities, knowing or having reason to know that such activities will promote or support the gang's illegal activities; and (2) has been convicted of a crime in the United States. The bill also provides for procedures for designating a group or organization a criminal gang, and also procedures for challenging and revoking such a designation. The Department of Justice may provide grants to states and local governments to assist (1) efforts to combat criminal and youth gangs, and (2) gangprevention activities.
Title
Singh's Law
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB98 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB574 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1106 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB574 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1106 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Organized crime
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Organized crime
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Violent crime
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/599/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s599/BILLS-116s599is.pdf |