US SB594 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 714.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2017 This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to work with a consortium, including the National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium, to support efforts to address cybersecurity risks and incidents, including threats or acts of terrorism. DHS may work with such a consortium to assist its national cybersecurity and communications integration center to: provide training to state and local first responders and officials, develop curriculums, and provide technical assistance; conduct cross-sector cybersecurity training and simulation exercises for state and local governments, critical infrastructure owners and operators, and private industry; help states and communities develop cybersecurity information sharing programs; and help incorporate cybersecurity risk and incident prevention and response into existing state and local emergency plans and continuity of operations plans. DHS's authority to carry out this bill terminates five years after its enactment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Cybersecurity Preparedness Consortium Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 714.
2018-12-04SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-410.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-03-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1465 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback