US SB587 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-21 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Inspector General Act of 1978 to provide that the President or certain agency heads may remove the Inspector General, or place an Inspector General on non-duty status, only if certain conditions are satisfied, and for other purposes.
Title
Securing Inspector General Independence Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3338 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB2662 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585.
HB2662 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/587/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s587/BILLS-117s587is.pdf |