US SB579 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to make a technical correction to the ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019.
Title
A bill to make a technical correction to the ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-3. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-11 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1334) |
2021-03-11 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1334) |
2021-03-11 | House | Mr. Thompson (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2021-03-08 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-03-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1029) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1649 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.