US SB578 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-11. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the definition of major food allergen for purposes of certain food-labeling requirements to specifically include sesame. In addition, the Department of Health and Human Services must report on certain information related to food allergy research and data collection activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FASTER Act of 2021 Food Allergy Safety, Treatment, Education, and Research Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 415 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-11. (TXT | PDF)
2021-04-23SenateSigned by President.
2021-04-20SenatePresented to President.
2021-04-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-04-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 11 (Roll no. 100). (text: CR H1749-1750)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1783)
2021-04-14HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-04-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 578.
2021-04-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1749-1751)
2021-04-14HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-03-08HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-03-08HouseReceived in the House.
2021-03-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1021; text: CR S1029)

Same As/Similar To

HB1202 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback