US SB576 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 197.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 197.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 14, United States Code, to require the Coast Guard to conduct icebreaking operations in the Great Lakes to minimize commercial disruption in the winter months, and for other purposes.
Title
Great Lakes Winter Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 197. |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1561 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.